ND SB2204 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 37-14-01.1, 37-14-03.3, and 37-14-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to veterans' relief and rehabilitation.
Title
Veterans' relief and rehabilitation.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Doug Larsen [R] | Sen. Mike Wobbema [R] |
Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 5 |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 2 |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Government and Veterans Affairs |
2023-01-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Agriculture and Veterans Affairs |