ND SB2197 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 55
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 55
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the state department of health to expand a dental sealant program for elementary aged students.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the state department of health to expand a dental sealant program for elementary aged students.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Rep. Curt Hofstad [R] |
Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 36 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 55 |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 15 6 2 |
2015-03-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2015-03-12 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |