ND SB2196 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact two new sections to chapter 61-40 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the infrastructure revolving loan fund and accrued and unpaid interest in western area water supply authority loans; to amend and reenact subsection 13 of section 61-40-05, and sections 61-40-09, 61-40-10, and 61-40-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the oversight of the western area water supply authority and infrastructure revolving loan fund payments; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
The oversight of the western area water supply authority and infrastructure revolving loan fund payments; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Patten [R] | Sen. Todd Beard [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Olson [R] | Rep. David Richter [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/01 |
2023-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/29 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 8 |
2023-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | Conference committee appointed Bosch Dockter J. Olson |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Patten Kannianen Sorvaag |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-03-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 10 |
2023-03-27 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-24 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 1 4 |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:40 |
2023-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2023-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-01-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:40 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |