ND SB2192 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 11-09.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county lodging and restaurant tax; to amend and reenact subsections 21, 22, and 23 of section 57-39.2-01, subdivision e of subsection 1 of section 57-39.2-02.1, and subsection 22 of section 57-39.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to references to tourist court accommodations; and to provide an effective date.
Title
References to tourist court accommodations; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Rep. Denton Zubke [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 51 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/26 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 51 nays 41 |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |