ND SB2168 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 30.1-28 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to confidentiality of reports and personal information in guardianship proceedings; and to amend and reenact section 30.1-28-03, subsection 5 of section 30.1-28-04, subsection 2 of section 30.1-28-05, subsections 1 and 2 of section 30.1-28-09, section 30.1-28-10.1, subsections 5, 8, and 9 of section 30.1-28-12, and subsection 2 of section 30.1-29-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to petitions, guardians ad litem, reports, contents of court orders, service of orders and notice requirements in guardianship proceedings, emergency guardians, guardian duties and annual reports, and the appointment of a conservator.
Title
Petitions, guardians ad litem, reports, contents of court orders, service of orders and notice requirements in guardianship proceedings, emergency guardians, guardian duties and annual reports, and the appointment of a conservator.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] |
Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/26 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 13 |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |