ND SB2151 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 19-03.5-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to access to the prescription drug monitoring program.
Title
Access to the prescription drug monitoring program.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Gerald Uglem [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/25 | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by Governor 04/25 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-22 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-21 | Returned to Senate | |
2011-03-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 | |
2011-03-16 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Received from Senate | |
2011-01-21 | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 | |
2011-01-20 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-01-18 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |