ND SB2148 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 21 of section 65-01-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to defining health care provider to include a physical therapist.
Title
Defining health care provider to include a physical therapist.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] |
Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Gary Paur [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1 |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-01-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |