ND SB2147 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 48-01.2-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bond requirements for public improvements.
Title
Bond requirements for public improvements.
Sponsors
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] |
Rep. Gary Sukut [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 1 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |