ND SB2147 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 24-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorization for two design-build contracts for highway or bridge projects; to provide for a report to the legislative assembly; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 24-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authorization for two design-build contracts for highway or bridge projects; to provide for a report to the legislative assembly; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-05 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-04 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-03 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-02 | Second reading, passed, yeas 088 nays 006 | |
2009-02-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Committee Hearing 09:20 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation | |
2009-01-20 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 042 nays 000 | |
2009-01-16 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-09 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2147.html |