ND SB2133 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 37-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to telephone services at the veterans' home; and to amend and reenact sections 37-15-10 and 37-15-14.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to admission to and fees paid by residents of the veterans' home.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 37-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to telephone services at the veterans' home; and to amend and reenact sections 37-15-10 and 37-15-14.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to admission to and fees paid by residents of the veterans' home.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-02 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-03-24 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 015 n 009 | |
2009-03-13 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-17 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-11 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-02-06 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2133.html |