ND SB2129 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 57-51-15 and 57-51.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legacy fund deposits of oil and gas tax collections and holding political subdivisions harmless against related allocation reductions; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Legacy fund deposits of oil and gas tax collections and holding political subdivisions harmless against related allocation reductions; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Bowman [R] | Sen. Stanley Lyson [R] | Rep. Shirley Meyer [D] | Rep. Shirley Meyer [D] |
Rep. Gary Sukut [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Sen. John Warner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/17 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-25 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-22 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-08 | Conference committee appointed Weiler Trottier Winrich | |
2011-04-06 | Refused to concur | |
2011-03-21 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-03-18 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 90 nays 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 | |
2011-03-07 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-01-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-05 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |