ND SB2124 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 49-03-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the issuance of a notice for an electric service area agreement.
Title
The issuance of a notice for an electric service area agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/19 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 2 |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |