ND SB2122 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 12-55.1-05, 12-59-02, 12-59-07, 12-59-08, 12-59-09, 12-59-10, 12-59-15, and 27-06-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers and duties of the parole board, the powers and duties of the pardon advisory board, and preparation and filing of transcripts in criminal actions.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 12-55.1-05, 12-59-02, 12-59-07, 12-59-08, 12-59-09, 12-59-10, 12-59-15, and 27-06-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers and duties of the parole board, the powers and duties of the pardon advisory board, and preparation and filing of transcripts in criminal actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-09 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-06 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-05 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-30 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 000 | |
2009-01-29 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-28 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-12 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2122.html |