ND SB2121 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 57-15-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the required content of the estimated property tax and budget hearing notice.
Title
The required content of the estimated property tax and budget hearing notice.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Weber [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Dale Patten [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 11:33 |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-01-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |