ND SB2100 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 39-04-37, a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 39-06.1-06, a new paragraph to subdivision a of subsection 3 of section 39-06.1-10, and a new subsection to section 39-21-06.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the amount of statutory fees, entries against driving record, and moving violations; to amend and reenact section 39-04-55, subsections 2 and 4 of section 39-05-17, subsection 3 of section 39-06-14.1, section 39-06-16, subdivision f of subsection 2 of section 39-06.1-06, subsection 1 of section 39-06.1-08, sections 39-06.1-09 and 39-07-05, subsection 2 of section 39-10-14, section 39-10-19, subsection 2 of section 39-10-26, subsections 1 and 2 of section 39-10-38, section 39-21-07, section 39-21-15, subsection 2 of section 39-21-26, subsection 1 of section 39-21-39, subsection 1 of section 39-21-45.1, subsection 11 of section 39-24-09, and subsection 9 of section 39-29-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the amount of statutory fees and moving violations; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The amount of statutory fees and moving violations; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 35 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |