ND SB2098 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 6-09-44 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Bank of North Dakota residential mortgage loan program.
Title
The Bank of North Dakota residential mortgage loan program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-08 | House | Emergency clause failed |
2019-03-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 62 nays 27 |
2019-03-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 1 5 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |