ND SB2098 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 43-11-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exemption from cosmetology licensure; and to amend and reenact sections 43-11-01, 43-11-03, 43-11-04, and 43-11-06, subsection 7 of section 43-11-16, sections 43-11-21, 43-11-24, 43-11-25, and 43-11-26, subdivision b of subsection 1 of section 43-11-28, and section 43-11-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees, the practice and licensing of cosmetologists, cosmetology salons, estheticians, instructors, manicurists, and schools, and the powers, membership, and compensation of the state board of cosmetology.
Title
Fees, the practice and licensing of cosmetologists, cosmetology salons, estheticians, instructors, manicurists, and schools, and the powers, membership, and compensation of the state board of cosmetology.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26 | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by Governor 04/26 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-15 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-13 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-01 | Conference committee appointed Hofstad Schmidt Holman | |
2011-03-31 | Refused to concur | |
2011-03-29 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0 | |
2011-03-25 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-08 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Received from Senate | |
2011-01-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 | |
2011-01-17 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-01-12 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |