ND SB2087 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 50-06-21 and 50-06-22 and subdivision a of subsection 4 of section 53-12.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to replacing the term "compulsive gambling" with "gambling disorder."
Title
Replacing the term "compulsive gambling" with "gambling disorder."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 3 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 86 |
2017-02-23 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-01-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |