ND SB2085 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15-01-02.1, 15-02-08, 15-03-01.1, 15-03-02, 15-03-04, 15-03-05.1, and 15-06-40 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the management of the trust funds under the control of the board of university and school lands; to repeal sections 15-03-05.2 and 15-08-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to distributions from trust funds under the control of the board of university and school lands; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15-01-02.1, 15-02-08, 15-03-01.1, 15-03-02, 15-03-04, 15-03-05.1, and 15-06-40 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the management of the trust funds under the control of the board of university and school lands; to repeal sections 15-03-05.2 and 15-08-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to distributions from trust funds under the control of the board of university and school lands; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-02 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-23 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 084 nays 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 014 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-01-29 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-01-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2085.html |