ND SB2071 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 53-06.2-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to allowing North Dakota racing commission licensees to utilize letters of credit as security.
Title
Allowing North Dakota racing commission licensees to utilize letters of credit as security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 26 |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |