ND SB2071 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 37-17.1-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to calling up retired former members of the North Dakota national guard to state active duty in times of disasters or emergencies; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Calling up retired former members of the North Dakota national guard to state active duty in times of disasters or emergencies; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07 | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by Governor 04/07 | |
2011-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-04 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-01 | Concurred | |
2011-03-09 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-03-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 1 | |
2011-03-07 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-04 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Received from Senate | |
2011-01-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 | |
2011-01-17 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-01-07 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |