ND SB2069 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Delmore A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 27-05.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees collected by the clerk of district court for deposit in the civil legal services fund.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Delmore A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 27-05.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees collected by the clerk of district court for deposit in the civil legal services fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-27 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 088 nays 004 | |
2009-04-27 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-24 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-24 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-24 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Thoreson Berg Glassheim | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Nething Lyson Fiebiger | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-06 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-06 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 072 nays 020 | |
2009-04-02 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2009-03-24 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 010 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-03-02 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 01:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-04 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-03 | Second reading, passed, yeas 042 nays 004 | |
2009-02-02 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 001 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 11:30 | |
2009-01-27 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2069.html |