ND SB2046 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 27-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of a pilot program for providing state services to juveniles adjudicated in tribal court; to provide for a report to legislative management; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
The establishment of a pilot program for providing state services to juveniles adjudicated in tribal court; to provide for a report to legislative management; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 16 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76 |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |