ND SB2045 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 27-02.1-01, 27-02.1-02, 27-02.1-03, 27-02.1-04, 27-02.1-05, 27-02.1-06, 27-02.1-07, 27-02.1-08, and 27-02.1-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the temporary court of appeals; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
The temporary court of appeals; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2023-03-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 2 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-01-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |