ND SB2044 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 12.1-21-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to tampering with or damaging a critical infrastructure facility or a public service; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Tampering with or damaging a critical infrastructure facility or a public service; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] | Rep. James Schmidt [R] |
Rep. Charles Damschen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 76 nays 14 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 1 3 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |