ND SB2042 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Government Services Committee) A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection
Title
An income tax deduction for retired military personnel pay; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 34 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 56 |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 26 nays 19 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 4 1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 33 nays 14 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |