ND SB2042 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 53-06.1-01 and sections 53-06.1-11, 53-06.1-12, and 53-06.1-12.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to consolidation of gaming taxes and allowable expenses; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
Consolidation of gaming taxes and allowable expenses; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/17 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/17 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-25 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-22 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Reconsidered | |
2011-04-18 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-15 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-15 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Conference committee appointed Owens Grande S. Kelsh | |
2011-03-31 | Refused to concur | |
2011-03-28 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-03-25 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 65 nays 22 | |
2011-03-24 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-23 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 1 3 | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-24 | Second reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 5 | |
2011-02-21 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 2 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-02-03 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-02-02 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 | |
2011-01-19 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |