ND SB2039 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by Governor 03/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 50-06.4-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to membership of the brain injury advisory council; and to provide for application.
Title
Membership of the brain injury advisory council; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/17 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |