ND SB2028 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study on the payment of extraordinary medical expenses for inmates.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study on the payment of extraordinary medical expenses for inmates.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 88 | |
2011-03-25 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2011-03-24 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 0 1 | |
2011-03-07 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-01-28 | Received from Senate | |
2011-01-27 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-26 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-01-12 | Committee Hearing 01:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |