ND SB2021 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the information technology department; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide for transfers; to provide for a legislative council study; to provide for a report; to provide a continuing appropriation; to amend and reenact section 15.1-02-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to membership of the statewide longitudinal data system committee; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the information technology department; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide for transfers; to provide for a legislative council study; to provide for a report; to provide a continuing appropriation; to amend and reenact section 15.1-02-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to membership of the statewide longitudinal data system committee; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 085 nays 005 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-29 | Second reading passed, y 047 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Thoreson Dosch Glassheim | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Christmann Fischer Robinson | |
2009-04-16 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-10 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-10 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-10 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 077 nays 014 | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 020 n 004 | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 01:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Committee Hearing 01:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-19 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 000 | |
2009-01-09 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2021.html |