ND SB2020 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota state university extension service, northern crops institute, upper great plains transportation institute, main research center, branch research centers, and agronomy seed farm; to amend and reenact sections 4-05.1-05 and 4-08-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to main research center experiment station and extension service position adjustments; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for budget section reports; to provide for a report to the appropriations committees; to provide an exemption; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Main research center experiment station and extension service position adjustments; to provide for a legislative management study; to provide for budget section reports; to provide for a report to the appropriations committees; to provide an exemption; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/26 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 58 nays 32 |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Erbele to replace Sen. Wanzek on conference committee |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Wanzek to replace Sen. Erbele on conference committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Monson Schmidt Boe |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Bowman Erbele Grabinger |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 16 |
2017-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 0 3 |
2017-03-24 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 2 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |