ND SB2019 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the parks and recreation department and the International Peace Garden; to provide for a transfer; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the parks and recreation department and the International Peace Garden; to provide for a transfer; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/09 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-27 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-08 | Conference committee appointed Martinson Dosch Williams | |
2011-04-06 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-05 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 84 nays 7 | |
2011-04-04 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-01 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 5 1 | |
2011-03-11 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-22 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 1 | |
2011-01-13 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |