ND SB2017 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of administrative hearings.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of administrative hearings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-29 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2009-04-27 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-27 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-24 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Nelson Kreidt Kerzman | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Wardner Holmberg Seymour | |
2009-04-16 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-10 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-10 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 090 nays 000 | |
2009-04-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-03 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 020 n 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-16 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-11 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-20 | Committee Hearing 02:45 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2017.html |