ND SB2016 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of the adjutant general; to provide appropriations; to provide for transfers; to provide exemptions; to amend and reenact section 37-17.3-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state radio fees; to provide legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Title
State radio fees; to provide legislative intent; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/05 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/05 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-27 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-26 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Conference committee appointed Klein Brandenburg Kroeber | |
2011-04-08 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-04-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 2 1 | |
2011-03-14 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 | |
2011-01-14 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |