ND SB2015 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Committee Hearing 10:00
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Mar 29 @ 10:00 am in Brynhild Haugland (Executive Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the various divisions under the supervision of the director of the office of management and budget; to create and enact a new subsection to section 54-44-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a facility management operating fund; to amend and reenact sections 48-10-02, 54-21-19, and 57-40.3-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the capitol grounds planning commission spending limit, capitol grounds rent collections, and the allocation of motor vehicle excise tax collections; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide a report; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The capitol grounds planning commission spending limit, capitol grounds rent collections, and the allocation of motor vehicle excise tax collections; to provide for a transfer; to provide an exemption; to provide a report; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2023-03-22HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2023-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 02:15
2023-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2023-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Appropriations
2023-02-22HouseReceived from Senate
2023-02-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 6, Emergency clause carried
2023-02-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-02-21SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 1 0
2023-02-20SenateCommittee Hearing 03:15
2023-02-20SenateCommittee Hearing 11:05
2023-02-16SenateCommittee Hearing 04:15
2023-02-14SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-02-08SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-01-25SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2023-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2023-01-05SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2023-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback