ND SB2003 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor, but item veto 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Signed by Governor, but item veto 05/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota university system; to create and enact two new sections to chapter 15-10 and a new section to chapter 54-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval of capital projects requested by institutions under the control of the state board of higher education, the nickel trophy, and tuition and fee waivers for law enforcement officers; and to amend and reenact sections 15-10-48, 15-10-49, 15-18.2-05, 15-18.2-06, 54-10-22.1, and 54-44.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to matching grants for institutions under the control of the state board of higher education, state aid to institutions, the minimum amount payable through the higher education funding formula, protecting donor records from audits of university and college foundations, and the cancellation of unexpended appropriations; to repeal chapter 15-10.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the midwestern higher education compact; to provide for the transfer of funds; to authorize the state board of higher education to issue and sell bonds for capital projects; to provide exemptions; to provide for the reallocation of oil and gas tax distributions; to authorize the conveyance of real property owned by the state of North Dakota; to provide for studies; to provide for legislative management reports; to provide legislative intent; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The midwestern higher education compact; to provide for the transfer of funds; to authorize the state board of higher education to issue and sell bonds for capital projects; to provide exemptions; to provide for the reallocation of oil and gas tax distributions; to authorize the conveyance of real property owned by the state of North Dakota; to provide for studies; to provide for legislative management reports; to provide legislative intent; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor, but item veto 05/02 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-27 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 71 nays 18 |
2017-04-27 | House | Reconsidered |
2017-04-27 | House | Emergency clause failed |
2017-04-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 62 nays 27 |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2, Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed Sanford Martinson Streyle |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Holmberg Krebsbach Robinson |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-04-14 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-14 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 77 nays 10 |
2017-04-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-04-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1 |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 03:45 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:45 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |