ND HCR3043 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-01 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study laboratory safety at institutions of higher education.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study laboratory safety at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Second reading, failed to adopt | |
2009-03-25 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 003 n 002 | |
2009-03-23 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar y 014 n 000 | |
2009-02-16 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-05 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba3043.html |