ND HCR3032 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Filed with Secretary Of State 01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-31 - Filed with Secretary Of State 01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress and the Internal Revenue Service to end the requirement of capitalization of business and farm machinery repair costs and allow business owners to deduct those costs as a business expense.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress and the Internal Revenue Service to end the requirement of capitalization of business and farm machinery repair costs and allow business owners to deduct those costs as a business expense.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Wesley Belter [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Jessica Haak [D] |
Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 01/12 |
2015-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-18 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 93 nays 0 |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |