ND HCR3027 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the estimated fiscal impact to the state of refracturing existing oil wells.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the estimated fiscal impact to the state of refracturing existing oil wells.
Sponsors
Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] |
Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/07 |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 92 nays 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-23 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, adopted as amended |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-03-06 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |