ND HCR3024 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution declaring June 27, 2017, and each June 27 thereafter, as "Posttraumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day" and the month of June 2017, and each June thereafter, as "Posttraumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month".
Title
A concurrent resolution declaring June 27, 2017, and each June 27 thereafter, as "Posttraumatic Stress Injury Awareness Day" and the month of June 2017, and each June thereafter, as "Posttraumatic Stress Injury Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] |
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29 |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-03-15 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 91 nays 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |