ND HCR3007 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 40 nays 50
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 40 nays 50
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the legalization, decriminalization, and taxation of marijuana.
Title
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the legalization, decriminalization, and taxation of marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 40 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Second reading, failed to adopt yeas 40 nays 50 |
2017-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 3 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |