ND HCR3002 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the operation, management, conditions, standards, and supervision of city, county, and regional correctional facilities and other potential means to improve the rehabilitative function of city, county, and regional correctional facilities and a possible transition of the supervision of city, county, and regional correctional facilities from the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to the Attorney General.
Title
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the operation, management, conditions, standards, and supervision of city, county, and regional correctional facilities and other potential means to improve the rehabilitative function of city, county, and regional correctional facilities and a possible transition of the supervision of city, county, and regional correctional facilities from the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to the Attorney General.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Randy Boehning [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] |
Rep. Denton Zubke [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. John Grabinger [D] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21 |
2017-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-24 | House | Second reading, adopted yeas 88 nays 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 1 |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:40 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |