ND HB1538 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-02 and a new section to chapter 20.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fishing contests, surcharge fees, and the fishing conservation fund; to amend and reenact subsection 20 of section 20.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the powers of the director of the game and fish department; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The powers of the director of the game and fish department; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09 |
2023-05-18 | House | Signed by Governor 05/05 |
2023-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 6 |
2023-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee report rejected |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Kessel Boehm Patten |
2023-04-06 | House | Conference committee appointed M. Ruby J. Olson Novak |
2023-04-06 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 34 nays 13 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 1 1 |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:20 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:07 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2023-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | Division B adopted |
2023-02-21 | House | Division A lost |
2023-02-21 | House | Division of amendment |
2023-02-20 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 0 4 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 03:55 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 10:55 |
2023-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |