ND HB1525 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 15.1-36-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a common schools building and renovation grant fund; to amend and reenact section 15-03-04 and subsection 1 of section 57-15-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legal investments and school district tax levies for building funds; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Title
Legal investments and school district tax levies for building funds; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a report to the legislative management.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Jeff Hoverson [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] |
Sen. Bob Paulson [R] | Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |