ND HB1513 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 006 nays 041
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 006 nays 041
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Christmann A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-44.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to continuation of unspent appropriation authority at the end of a biennium; to create a government innovation and efficiency grant program; to create a state employee innovation award program; to provide reports to the legislative council; to provide a contingent appropriation; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Christmann A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-44.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to continuation of unspent appropriation authority at the end of a biennium; to create a government innovation and efficiency grant program; to create a state employee innovation award program; to provide reports to the legislative council; to provide a contingent appropriation; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Berg [R] | Rep. Lee Kaldor [D] | Rep. David Monson [R] | Rep. Robert Skarphol [R] |
Rep. Ken Svedjan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-11 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 006 nays 041 | |
2009-03-10 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-04 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-16 | Received from House | |
2009-02-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 076 nays 015 | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 020 n 004 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1513.html |