ND HB1494 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to school meal policies.
Title
School meal policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/10 |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by Governor 04/07 |
2023-04-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2023-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-28 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:20 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1 |
2023-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:32 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |