ND HB1463 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Flakoll, Robinson, Seymour A BILL for an Act to create and enact four new sections to chapter 54-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a state youth council; to provide for a report to the legislative council; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Flakoll, Robinson, Seymour A BILL for an Act to create and enact four new sections to chapter 54-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a state youth council; to provide for a report to the legislative council; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Clark [R] | Rep. Lee Myxter [D] | Rep. Lisa Wolf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-09 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-06 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 059 nays 031 | |
2009-04-06 | Concurred | |
2009-03-11 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-10 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 038 nays 008 | |
2009-03-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 003 n 002 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-13 | Received from House | |
2009-02-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 051 nays 039 | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 010 n 002 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-19 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1463.html |