ND HB1434 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 6 of section 20.1-03-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fishing license fees for the disabled.
Title
Fishing license fees for the disabled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Governor 04/02 |
2013-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-12 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2013-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |