ND HB1434 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-15-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permits to operate pharmacies.
Title
Permits to operate pharmacies.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Stacy Dahl [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] | Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 68 | |
2011-02-18 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 | |
2011-02-15 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1434.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0568-01000.pdf |