ND HB1418 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Signed by Governor 04/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of statements of interests.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of statements of interests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Signed by Governor 04/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 5 |
2017-04-07 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 5 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 7 |
2017-02-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 1 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |